Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Elie de Voyer de Paulmy d’Argenson

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1665BornParis
15 Apr 170236.5SelectedBishop of Dol, France
11 Dec 170237.2ConfirmedBishop of Dol, France
18 Mar 170337.4Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
12 Jan 171549.3SelectedArchbishop of Embrun, France
16 Dec 171550.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Embrun, France
6 May 172054.6AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
25 Oct 172863.0DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for François-Elie de Voyer de Paulmy d’Argenson:
Archbishop François-Elie de Voyer de Paulmy d’Argenson (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 130, and Page 186
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015