Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Pierre d’Argouges

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹BornParis
8 Jan 172136.0SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
16 Jun 172136.4ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
3 Aug 172136.5Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
13 Nov 173146.8DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Pierre d’Argouges:
Bishop Michel Pierre d’Argouges (born 1685, died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015