Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Gaston Fleuriau d’Armenonville

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1662BornParis
20 Sep 168725.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 169835.7SelectedBishop of Aire, France
24 Nov 169836.4ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
18 Jan 169936.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
14 Jun 169936.9InstalledBishop of Aire, France
14 Aug 170644.1SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
15 Nov 170644.4ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
9 Jun 173370.9DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Gaston Fleuriau d’Armenonville:
Bishop Louis-Gaston Fleuriau d’Armenonville (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70, and Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015