Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard-François de Poudenx de Castillon

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661¹BornPoudenx
10 Feb 170847.1SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
14 May 170847.3ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
26 Aug 170847.6Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
19 Jan 170948.0DiedBishop of Marseille, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard-François de Poudenx de Castillon:
Bishop Bernard-François de Poudenx de Castillon (born 1661, died ) Bishop of Marseille

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015