Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Briqueville de La Luzerne

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658¹BornIsigny
31 May 169335.4SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
28 Sep 169335.7ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
28 Oct 169335.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
16 Jul 174183.5DiedBishop of Cahors, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri de Briqueville de La Luzerne:
Bishop Henri de Briqueville de La Luzerne (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a bishop for 47.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015