Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Augustin de Mailly, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649¹BornParis
14 Aug 168738.6SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
15 Oct 169243.7ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
16 Nov 169243.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
23 Dec 171263.9DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Victor-Augustin de Mailly:
Bishop Victor-Augustin de Mailly C.R.S.A. (born 1649, died ) Bishop of Lavaur

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 406
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015