Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Tulles

Deceased

Bishop of Orange, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1572AppointedBishop of Orange, France
5 Oct 1572Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
5 Aug 1608DiedBishop of Orange, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Tulles
Bishop Jean de Tulles (died ) Bishop of Orange

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGrand Chapel, Palace of the Popes, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Death PlaceCaderousse

  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1572, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018