Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Cros

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
19 Jul 159934.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
30 Apr 160035.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
24 Feb 163065.1DiedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Cros
Bishop Antoine de Cros (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRicherenche

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,600, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 344
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast