Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Antoine de la Garde de Chambonas

Deceased

Bishop of Viviers (Aps), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636¹Born
25 Jan 167135.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 167135.1SelectedBishop of Lodève, France
28 Sep 167135.7ConfirmedBishop of Lodève, France
15 Nov 167135.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
22 Sep 169054.7SelectedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
5 May 169256.3ConfirmedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
21 Feb 171377.1DiedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Antoine de la Garde de Chambonas
Bishop Charles-Antoine de la Garde de Chambonas (born 1636, died ) Bishop of Viviers (Aps)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambonas

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 246, and Page 417
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,671, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast