Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de La Vergne-Montenard de Tressan

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹Born
15 Apr 166931.2SelectedBishop of Vabres, France
2 Jun 167032.4ConfirmedBishop of Vabres, France
19 Oct 167032.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vabres, France
17 Aug 167133.6SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
21 Mar 167234.2ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
27 Jan 171274.0DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de La Vergne-Montenard de Tressan
Bishop Louis de La Vergne-Montenard de Tressan (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeziers

  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154, and Page 401
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018