Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hardouin Fortin de la Hoguette

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1643³BornChamouillac
12 Sep 167532.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
23 Mar 167632.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
3 May 167632.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
2 Feb 168036.5SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
15 Jul 168037.0ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
9 Nov 168542.3SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
21 Jan 169248.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
28 Nov 171572.4DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hardouin Fortin de la Hoguette:
Archbishop Hardouin Fortin de la Hoguette (born Jul 1643, died ) Archbishop of Sens

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126, and Page 314
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015