Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Caillebot de La Salle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹BornClères
21 May 169038.3SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
5 May 169240.3ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
31 Aug 169240.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
May 1703³51.3ResignedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
11 Dec 173684.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Caillebot de La Salle:
Bishop François de Caillebot de La Salle (born 1652, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015