Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin de Ratabon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654¹BornParis
28 Mar 168228.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 168935.4SelectedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
12 Oct 169339.7ConfirmedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
6 Dec 169339.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
5 Jan 171359.0ResignedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
22 Apr 171359.3SelectedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
18 Sep 171359.7ConfirmedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
20 Feb 172369.1ResignedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
8 Jun 172874.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin de Ratabon:
Bishop Martin de Ratabon (born 1654, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps)

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 417, and Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015