Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François Du Plessis de Mornay, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1663BornVannes, France
168723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Jun 171349.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
26 Feb 171450.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
26 Feb 171450.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
22 Apr 171450.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
26 Dec 172764.2SucceededBishop of Québec, Canada
12 Sep 173369.9ResignedBishop of Québec, Canada
28 Nov 174178.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis-François Du Plessis de Mornay:
Bishop Louis-François Du Plessis de Mornay O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Québec

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015