Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique-Marie Varlet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baghdad

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1678BornParis
170627.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 171840.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq
17 Sep 171840.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
19 Feb 171940.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
20 Feb 171940.9SucceededBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
25 May 171941.1RemovedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
14 May 174264.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Marie Varlet:
Bishop Dominique-Marie Varlet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baghdad

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 100, and Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015