Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Bénigne Bossuet

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1627BornDijon
16 Mar 165224.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 166941.9SelectedBishop of Condom, France
2 Jun 167042.6ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
21 Sep 167042.9Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
31 Oct 167144.0ResignedBishop of Condom, France
21 May 168153.6SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
17 Nov 168154.1ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
12 Apr 170476.5DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Bénigne Bossuet:
Bishop Jacques-Bénigne Bossuet (born , died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015