Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Le Peletier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1661BornParis
15 Oct 169231.1AppointedBishop of Angers, France
16 Nov 169231.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
7 Jun 170644.8ResignedBishop of Angers, France
9 Aug 170645.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Angers, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Michel Le Peletier:
Bishop Michel Le Peletier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angers

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015