Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)

Dioecesis Augustodunensis (-Cabillonensis-Matisconensis-Cluniacensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 15 December 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Dijon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 8,575 (3,312 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-autun.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 1 place Cardinal Perraud, 71407 Autun CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 3.85.86.97.34
  • Fax: 3.85.86.97.31

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Autun
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Autun (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Chalons-sur-Saône (suppressed) Diocese of Autun
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Clamecy (suppressed) Diocese of Autun
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Mâcon (suppressed) Diocese of Autun
Archdiocese of Lyon
Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)
19 July 1853Name ChangedDiocese of Autun Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)
Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)
15 December 1962UnitedDiocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)
Territorial Abbey of Cluny
Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny) (from Lyon)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)
1950503,000508,74998.9%583766597631281,341554ap1951
1959504,000511,00098.6%536405768751071,298554ap1960
Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)
1969506,381550,38192.0%469214901,033481,100257ap1971
1980570,060580,06098.3%402134151,37336808545ap1981
1990579,000592,00097.8%330223521,6441286612545ap1991
1999550,000560,00098.2%252152672,0592185560365ap2000
2000525,000540,87397.1%250152651,9812067540324ap2001
2001525,000540,87397.1%246152612,011267540334ap2002
2002525,000540,87397.1%231152462,1342130528302ap2003
2003520,000544,98395.4%22592342,22224122305302ap2004
2004520,000544,98395.4%247202671,94724136407302ap2005
2006522,000547,00095.4%228122402,1752416043650ap2007
2012548,000575,00095.3%162121743,149285142349ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014