Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard de La Valette de Thomas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Autun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1673¹Born
12 Apr 173259.2SelectedBishop of Autun, France
11 Aug 173259.6ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
14 Sep 173259.7Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
Feb 1748³75.0RetiredBishop of Autun, France
10 Jul 174875.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Autun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspard de La Valette de Thomas
Bishop Gaspard de La Valette de Thomas (born 1673, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Autun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Valette-du-Var

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 67
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 31
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Nov 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,613

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018