Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Désiré-Hyacinthe Berthoin

Deceased

Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1855BornChatte
15 Jun 187822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Grenoble, France
1 Jun 191559.6AppointedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
22 Jul 191559.8Ordained BishopBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
24 Feb 192266.4DiedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France

MicroData Summary for Désiré-Hyacinthe Berthoin:
Bishop Désiré-Hyacinthe Berthoin (born , died ) Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 38
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013