Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hector-Irénée Cardinal Sévin

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1852BornSimandre
10 Jun 187624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Belley, France
9 Mar 190856.0AppointedBishop of Châlons, France
5 Apr 190856.0Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France
2 Dec 191260.7AppointedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
25 May 191462.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 191462.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
4 May 191664.1DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Hector-Irénée Sévin:
Cardinal Hector-Irénée Sévin (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
  • a cardinal for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 23
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013