Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspard-Marie-Michel-André Latty

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1844Born
19 Sep 186824.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 189449.8SelectedBishop of Châlons, France
21 May 189449.8ConfirmedBishop of Châlons, France
8 Sep 189450.1Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France
15 Sep 189450.1InstalledBishop of Châlons, France
15 Oct 190763.2AppointedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
3 Feb 190863.5InstalledArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
3 Oct 192884.1DiedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

MicroData Summary for Gaspard-Marie-Michel-André Latty (VIAF: 167142786)
Archbishop Gaspard-Marie-Michel-André Latty (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagnes
Ordained BishopSacre-Coeur, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017