Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthieu-Victor-Félicien Balaïn, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1828Born
6 Mar 185223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
22 Nov 187749.4SelectedBishop of Nice, France
28 Dec 187749.5ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
25 Feb 187849.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
10 Mar 187849.7InstalledBishop of Nice, France
30 May 189668.0SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
25 Jun 189668.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
3 Sep 189668.2InstalledArchbishop of Auch, France
13 May 190576.9DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Matthieu-Victor-Félicien Balaïn
Archbishop Matthieu-Victor-Félicien Balaïn O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Victor
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fréjus, Diocese of Fréjus

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 135, and Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017