Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Pascal, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1848BornSt-Genès-de-Beauzon, France
1 Nov 187325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 Jun 189142.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saskatchewan, Canada
2 Jun 189142.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
28 Jun 189142.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
3 Dec 190759.3AppointedBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
12 Jul 192071.9DiedBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Albert Pascal:
Bishop Albert Pascal O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Prince-Albert

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013