Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arthur Béliveau

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1870BornMont Carmel de Champlain
24 Sep 189323.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 191343.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
24 May 191343.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
25 Jul 191343.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
9 Nov 191545.7AppointedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
14 Sep 195585.5DiedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Arthur Béliveau:
Archbishop Arthur Béliveau (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint-Boniface

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013