Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Édouard-Charles Fabre

Deceased

Archbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1827Born
23 Feb 185022.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 187346.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
1 Apr 187346.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
1 May 187346.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
11 May 187649.2SucceededBishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
8 Jun 188659.2AppointedArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
30 Dec 189669.8DiedArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Édouard-Charles Fabre (VIAF: 38347473)
Archbishop Édouard-Charles Fabre (born , died ) Archbishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopGesu, Montréal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 290, and Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017