Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Racine

Deceased

Bishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1828Born
24 Sep 185325.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 187850.3AppointedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
4 Aug 187850.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
28 Jan 188860.0DiedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Dominique Racine (VIAF: 13767397)
Bishop Dominique Racine (born , died ) Bishop of Chicoutimi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt.-Ambroise, Jeune-Lorette, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017