Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Racine

Deceased

Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1822Born
12 Sep 184422.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 187452.5AppointedBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
18 Oct 187452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
17 Jul 189371.4DiedBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Antoine Racine (VIAF: 56599309)
Bishop Antoine Racine (born , died ) Bishop of Sherbrooke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Ambroise, Jeune-Lorette, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017