Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Rimouski

Archidioecesis Sancti Germani



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pierre-André Fournier, Archbishop
  • Bertrand Blanchet, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 9 February 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Québec
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 20,225 (7,811 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Quebec
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: R
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceserimouski.com/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 34 rue de l’Ev&ecaret;ché Ouest, Rimouski, QC G5L 4H5, Canada
  • Telephone: (418)723-3320
  • Fax: 722-8978

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of)
15 January 1867ErectedArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of) (erected)
29 May 1882Territory LostDiocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of) Prefecture Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent (erected)
5 May 1922Territory LostDiocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of) Diocese of Gaspé (erected)
Archdiocese of Rimouski
9 February 1946ElevatedDiocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of) Archdiocese of Rimouski

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Rimouski
1950172,940173,98999.4%273423155491441,033115ap1951
1965183,018185,80098.5%308573655011821,472119ap1967
1970168,304169,67599.2%302543564721761,329115ap1971
1976159,990162,02798.7%25747304526941,172119ap1977
1980161,630164,38798.3%203632666071110986117ap1981
1990158,828163,18197.3%16663229693106885117ap1991
1999151,099155,46597.2%123231461,034467747118ap2000
2000150,448155,37596.8%117261431,052771731118ap2001
2001149,828154,43797.0%113261391,0771066731118ap2002
2002148,374152,91497.0%115191341,1071057688118ap2003
2003144,485148,76697.1%111161271,137954667114ap2004
2004144,272148,34197.3%109131221,182953643114ap2005
2010147,000149,80098.1%876931,5801429564105ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 16 Apr 2013