Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges-Alexandre Courchesne

Deceased

Archbishop of Rimouski, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1880BornSaint-Thomas-de-Pierreville
10 Jul 190423.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 192847.4AppointedBishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada
24 May 192847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada
11 Feb 194665.4AppointedArchbishop of Rimouski, Québec, Canada
14 Nov 195070.2DiedArchbishop of Rimouski, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Georges-Alexandre Courchesne:
Archbishop Georges-Alexandre Courchesne (born , died ) Archbishop of Rimouski

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013