Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro di Maria

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1865Born
23 May 189125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Dec 190641.3AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
30 Dec 190641.4Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
11 Jun 191852.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
11 Jun 191852.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Canada and Newfoundland
3 Jun 192660.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
1 Sep 193570.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
3 Sep 193772.0DiedApostolic Nuncio

MicroData Summary for Pietro di Maria
(VIAF: 14904837; WikiData: Q26945318)
Archbishop Pietro di Maria (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoliterno, Diocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni de Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCollège Bohème, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMoliterno, Diocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 84
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 248
  • b: Dictionnaire Biographique des Évèques Catholiques du Canada, Page 194, and Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024