Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas O’Donnell

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1874BornKerry, Ireland
23 Dec 189925.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 192349.4AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
14 Feb 192449.5Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
20 Mar 192449.6InstalledBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
27 May 192954.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
27 May 192954.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Methymna
26 Jan 193156.4SucceededArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
13 Jan 193661.4DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Donnell:
Archbishop Thomas O’Donnell (born , died ) Archbishop of Halifax

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1924, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013