Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Victoria

Dioecesis Victoriensis in Insula Vancouver



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gary Michael Gordon, Bishop
  • Remi Joseph De Roo, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 1 October 1908
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Vancouver
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: British Columbia
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 95,275 (36,799 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Vic
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcdvictoria.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 4044 Nelthorpe Street, Victoria, B.C. V8X 2A1, Canada
  • Telephone: (250)479-1331
  • Fax: 479-5423

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Vancouver Island
24 July 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory Diocese of Vancouver Island (erected)
14 December 1863Territory LostDiocese of Vancouver Island Vicariate Apostolic of British Columbia (erected)
Archdiocese of Vancouver Island
19 June 1903ElevatedDiocese of Vancouver Island Archdiocese of Vancouver Island
Archdiocese of Victoria
27 July 1894Territory LostDiocese of New Westminster
Archdiocese of Victoria
Prefecture Apostolic of Alaska (erected)
6 September 1904ErectedArchdiocese of Vancouver Island Archdiocese of Victoria (erected)
Diocese of Victoria
1 October 1908ElevatedArchdiocese of Victoria Diocese of Victoria (Archdiocese lowered to a Diocese)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Victoria
195018,000150,98311.9%2718454002524036ap1951
196628,000290,8359.6%3124555094021045ap1967
197033,000333,9519.9%3123546113018453ap1971
197638,000381,79610.0%2223458443215351ap1977
198044,300447,0009.9%2324479423213658ap1981
199079,000493,00016.0%2518431,8372211758ap1991
199990,000655,24913.7%2817452,000219329ap2000
200090,000655,24913.7%2816442,045209029ap2001
200190,000655,24913.7%2718452,000229429ap2002
200290,000705,11312.8%2515402,250199430ap2003
200390,000705,11312.8%2019392,307239441ap2004
200494,465693,49613.6%2215372,5531199130ap2005
201095,920704,99313.6%3015452,131196830ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jun 2014