Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Nicolaas Lemmens

Deceased

Bishop of Vancouver Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1850Born
27 Mar 187524.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 188837.9AppointedBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
5 Aug 188838.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
10 Aug 189747.1DiedBishop of Vancouver Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Joannes Nicolaas Lemmens (VIAF: 281896468)
Bishop Joannes Nicolaas Lemmens (born , died ) Bishop of Vancouver Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchimmert, Vicariate Apostolic of Limburg, Netherlands

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 582
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017