Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Roosevelt Bayley

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1814BornNew York, NY
26 Apr 184227.7Converted
2 Mar 184429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
29 Jul 185338.9AppointedBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
30 Oct 185339.2Ordained BishopBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
1 Nov 185339.2InstalledBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
30 Jul 187257.9AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
13 Oct 187258.1InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Oct 187763.1DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for James Roosevelt Bayley:
Archbishop James Roosevelt Bayley (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 140, and Page 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013