Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Allen Paul Curtis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

Titular Bishop of Echinus

Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1831Born
18 Apr 187240.7Converted
19 Dec 187443.4Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Aug 188655.0AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
14 Nov 188655.3Ordained BishopBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
25 Nov 188655.3InstalledBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
23 May 189664.8ResignedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
2 Jun 189664.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
189765.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
11 Jul 190877.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for Alfred Allen Paul Curtis (VIAF: 78324032)
Bishop Alfred Allen Paul Curtis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington

EventPlace
Birth PlacePocomoke, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256, and Page 599
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017