Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Moore

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1835Born
9 Apr 186024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
16 Feb 187741.6AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
13 May 187741.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
20 May 187741.8InstalledBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
30 Jul 190166.0DiedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for John Moore (VIAF: 53153324)
Bishop John Moore (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastletown-Devlin, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt John Baptist, Pro-Cathderal, Charlestown, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017