Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Albert Andrew Becker

Deceased

Bishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1832Born
10 May 185320.3Converted
18 Jun 185926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Mar 186835.1AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
16 Aug 186835.6Ordained BishopBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
26 Mar 188653.2AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
16 May 188653.3InstalledBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
29 Jul 189966.5DiedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Albert Andrew Becker (VIAF: 11230775)
Bishop Thomas Albert Andrew Becker (born , died ) Bishop of Savannah

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 504, and Page 598
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017