Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis August Anthony Joseph Janssens

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1843Born
21 Dec 186724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
18 Feb 188137.3AppointedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
1 May 188137.5Ordained BishopBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
7 Aug 188844.8AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
16 Sep 188844.9InstalledArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
10 Jun 189753.6DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis August Anthony Joseph Janssens (VIAF: 10650322)
Archbishop Francis August Anthony Joseph Janssens (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTilburg, Netherlands
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre, Cathedral, Richmond, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 403, and Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017