Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Richmond

Dioecesis Richmondiensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 July 1820ErectedArchdiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Richmond (erected)
19 July 1850Territory LostDiocese of Richmond Diocese of Wheeling (erected)
15 August 1858Territory AddedArchdiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Richmond (Alexandria)
28 May 1974Territory LostDiocese of Richmond
Archdiocese of Washington
Diocese of Arlington (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195080,6102,950,0002.7%1289222036611651283ap1951
1965217,8404,074,3595.3%182182364598203860166ap1967
1970263,5144,742,9255.6%190193383688237853123ap1971
1976109,3333,509,1073.1%1259922448811142590ap1977
1980111,0113,685,7203.0%15184235472193414100ap1981
1990141,2615,168,0002.7%170482186471059369143ap1991
1999191,0514,507,8194.2%16441205931246210142ap2000
2000196,7014,519,4654.4%158381961,0032645210144ap2001
2001200,3424,555,1394.4%164362001,0012744198147ap2002
2002208,0084,674,9754.4%165362011,0343447187147ap2003
2003213,5284,727,6384.5%158361941,1008247187148ap2004
2004212,1894,727,6304.5%165382031,0458351193148ap2005
2010233,0004,942,1004.7%164301941,2018543205151ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Sep 2014