Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Joseph O’Connell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Richmond, Virginia

Titular Bishop of Mariamme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1849BornDonoughmore, Ireland
26 May 187728.3Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
188535.9AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
189545.9ResignedRector of the Pontifical North American College
16 Dec 190758.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
3 May 190859.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
24 Dec 190859.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
19 Jan 191263.0AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
19 Mar 191263.2InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
15 Jan 192677.0RetiredBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
15 Jan 192677.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
1 Jan 192777.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Denis Joseph O’Connell:
Bishop Denis Joseph O’Connell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Richmond

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014