Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Joseph Hanna

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California

Titular Archbishop of Gortyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1860BornRochester
30 May 188524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
22 Oct 191252.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
22 Oct 191252.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
4 Dec 191252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
1 Jun 191554.8AppointedArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
2 Mar 193574.6RetiredArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
2 Mar 193574.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gortyna
10 Jul 194483.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Hanna:
Archbishop Edward Joseph Hanna (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Francisco

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1912, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015