Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Cantwell

Deceased

Archbishop of Los Angeles, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1874BornLimerick, Ireland
18 Jun 189924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
21 Sep 191742.8AppointedBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Dec 191743.0Ordained BishopBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
1 Jun 192247.5AppointedBishop of Los Angeles-San Diego, California, USA
11 Jul 193661.6AppointedArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
3 Dec 193662.0InstalledArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
30 Oct 194772.9DiedArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Cantwell:
Archbishop John Joseph Cantwell (born , died ) Archbishop of Los Angeles

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013