Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sacramento

Dioecesis Sacramentensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jaime Soto, Bishop
  • Myron Joseph Cotta, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Francis Anthony Quinn, Bishop Emeritus
  • William Keith Weigand, Bishop Emeritus

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 May 1886ErectedDiocese of Grass Valley (suppressed)
Archdiocese of San Francisco
Diocese of Sacramento (erected)
27 March 1931Territory LostDiocese of Salt Lake
Diocese of Sacramento
Diocese of Reno (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostDiocese of Sacramento (Del Norte, Humboldt, Calaveras, Tuolumne, and Mono Counties)
Archdiocese of San Francisco (Solano County)
Diocese of Stockton (erected)
15 September 1966Territory LostDiocese of Sacramento (Alpine County) Diocese of Stockton

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950202,475809,90025.0%126201461,3863227468ap1951
1966221,5141,495,40014.8%1947026483914051087ap1967
1970228,3371,477,40015.5%1786324194711843589ap1971
1976222,4611,618,30013.7%16565230967112935190ap1977
1980240,5701,872,00012.9%18176257936112032791ap1981
1990360,0002,530,40014.2%178702481,4517811528095ap1991
1999454,0002,873,64615.8%165712361,9231022919198ap2000
2000454,6002,876,35715.8%191652561,7751029918698ap2001
2001477,3303,020,34015.8%178642421,9721159618498ap2002
2002500,0973,125,61016.0%179622412,0751158717998ap2003
2003510,0993,169,75016.1%182642462,0731108917098ap2004
2004520,3013,229,94516.1%192542462,1151387618098ap2005
2010980,6503,533,65227.8%193622553,84514888161105ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Mar 2014