Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stephen Cummins

Bishop Emeritus of Oakland, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1928 BornOakland
24 Jan 195324.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
26 Feb 197446.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
26 Feb 197446.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
16 May 197446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
3 May 197749.2AppointedBishop of Oakland, California, USA
30 Jun 197749.3InstalledBishop of Oakland, California, USA
1 Oct 200375.6RetiredBishop of Oakland, California, USA

MicroData Summary for John Stephen Cummins:
Bishop John Stephen Cummins (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Oakland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oakland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013