Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Roger Michael Cardinal Mahony

Archbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1936 BornHollywood
1 May 196226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Fresno, California, USA
7 Jan 197538.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fresno, California, USA
7 Jan 197538.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamascani
19 Mar 197539.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamascani
15 Feb 198043.9AppointedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
17 Apr 198044.1InstalledBishop of Stockton, California, USA
12 Jul 198549.3AppointedArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Sep 198549.5InstalledArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
28 Jun 199155.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199155.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
1 Mar 201175.0RetiredArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Roger Michael Mahony:
Roger Michael Cardinal Mahony (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015