Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patrick Joseph Cardinal Hayes

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1867BornNew York
8 Sep 189224.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
3 Jul 191446.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
3 Jul 191446.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
28 Oct 191446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
24 Nov 191750.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Military, USA
10 Mar 191951.3AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
24 Mar 192456.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 Mar 192456.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
4 Sep 193870.8DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Hayes:
Cardinal Patrick Joseph Hayes (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014