Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Vincent Dargin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Amphipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1898Born
23 Sep 192224.4Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
25 Aug 195355.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
25 Aug 195355.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amphipolis
5 Oct 195355.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amphipolis
11 Aug 197375.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
20 Apr 198182.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Vincent Dargin (VIAF: 9467974)
Bishop Edward Vincent Dargin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast