Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Maria Pernicone

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1903BornRegalbuto, Italy
18 Dec 192623.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 195450.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
6 Apr 195450.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
5 May 195450.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
28 Nov 197875.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
11 Feb 198581.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Maria Pernicone:
Bishop Joseph Maria Pernicone (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013