Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Murphy Cardinal Farley

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1842BornNewtown-Hamilton, Ireland
11 Jun 187028.1Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
18 Nov 189553.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
18 Nov 189553.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
21 Dec 189553.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
15 Sep 190260.4AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
27 Nov 191169.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191169.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
17 Sep 191876.4DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Murphy Farley:
Cardinal John Murphy Farley (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
  • a cardinal for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 407, and Page 603

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014